SD HB1192 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the use of motorized foot scooters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the use of motorized foot scooters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Transportation: Deferred to another day (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Transportation: Hoghoused (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 527
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 450
2021-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 421
2021-03-03HousePrime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 483
2021-03-03SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2021-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-03-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 366
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 419
2021-02-23HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-18HouseTransportation Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-18HouseTransportation Hoghoused, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. Amendment 1192A
2021-02-04HouseTransportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 179
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 165

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback