SD HB1192 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the protection and enhancement of wildlife habitat and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the protection and enhancement of wildlife habitat and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 800 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 784 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 726 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 770 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 15. H.J. 761 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 745 Amendment cc1192a |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 737 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 706 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 695 Amendment Cc1192a |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 687 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 724 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 651 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 633 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1192mc |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 370 |
2015-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 15. H.J. 366 |
2015-02-06 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 322 |
2015-02-06 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1192na |
2015-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 249 |