SD HB1192 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase certain registration fees for the use of motor vehicles on the public highways.
Title
Increase certain registration fees for the use of motor vehicles on the public highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Veto override (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Veto override (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State H.J. 738 | |
2011-03-10 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 687 | |
2011-03-10 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 715 | |
2011-03-10 | Vetoed by the Governor H.J. 713 | |
2011-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 585 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 554 | |
2011-02-25 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 533 | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 468 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 13. H.J. 426 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 403 | |
2011-02-10 | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 353 | |
2011-02-10 | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1192fa | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-27 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 195 |