SD HB1190 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Transportation Tabled, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Transportation Tabled, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the process to vacate a part of certain highways.
Title
Revise the process to vacate a part of certain highways.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Mulally [R] | Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] |
Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Transportation: Tabled (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Transportation Tabled, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-09 | House | Transportation Deferred to another day, Passed |
2021-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Transportation H.J. 179 |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading House H.J. 165 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/22120 |
Text | https://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/214953.pdf |
Roll Call | https://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/69183 |