SD HB1190 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enhance customer convenience in firearms transactions, improve public safety, and provide for the issuance of an additional concealed pistol permit.
Title
Enhance customer convenience in firearms transactions, improve public safety, and provide for the issuance of an additional concealed pistol permit.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Rep. Steve Westra [R] |
Sen. Dean Wink [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] |
Sen. Alan Solano [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 548 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 500 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 429 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 649 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 649 Amendment 1190sa |
2016-02-19 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 458 |
2016-02-19 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1190yb |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-10 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2016-02-10 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1190ya |
2016-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 256 |