SD HB1184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain persons working in postsecondary technical institutes from collective bargaining provisions.
Title
Exempt certain persons working in postsecondary technical institutes from collective bargaining provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 710 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 716 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 668 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 637 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 622 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 581 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 500 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 435 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 5. H.J. 401 |
2017-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 274 |