SD HB1182 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the renewal of an enhanced permit to carry a concealed pistol.
Title
Provide for the renewal of an enhanced permit to carry a concealed pistol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 502 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 477 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 404 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 338 |
2020-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 358 |
2020-02-19 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-19 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1182A |
2020-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |