SD HB1182 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the filing deadlines for the nomination of certain independent candidates.
Title
Revise the filing deadlines for the nomination of certain independent candidates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 1. S.J. 559 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 499 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 245 | |
2012-01-31 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 22. H.J. 265 | |
2012-01-30 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 234 | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 156 |