SD HB1179 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the period within which tax deeds may be procured.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the period within which tax deeds may be procured.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Signed by Governor H.J. 716 | |
2010-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 500 | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 619 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 465 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 449 | |
2010-02-22 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 392 | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 351 | |
2010-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 26. H.J. 406 | |
2010-02-12 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 387 | |
2010-02-11 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 364 | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 222 |