SD HB1178 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to false statements pertaining to aircraft registration and associated penalties.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to false statements pertaining to aircraft registration and associated penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Feinstein [D] | Rep. Anne Hajek [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 676 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 637 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 594 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 3. S.J. 489 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 467 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 441 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 416 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 391 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 372 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 354 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 324 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 259 |
2014-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 318 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-05 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 289 |
2014-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 178 |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House H.J. 157 |