SD HB1177 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish provisions to exempt breastfeeding mothers or new parents from jury duty.
Title
Establish provisions to exempt breastfeeding mothers or new parents from jury duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 442 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 402 | |
2012-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 244 | |
2012-01-31 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 260 | |
2012-01-26 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-26 | Health and Human Services Title amended, Passed Amendment 1177jtb | |
2012-01-26 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 213 | |
2012-01-26 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1177jb | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 155 |