SD HB1176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 653
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 653
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding campaign finance disclosure reports.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding campaign finance disclosure reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Dennert [R] | Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Rep. Blaine Campbell [R] |
Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 653 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 400 |
2018-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 361 |
2018-02-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 307 |
2018-02-02 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1176ka |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179 |