SD HB1175 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Define dyslexia for the purposes of special education and related services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Define dyslexia for the purposes of special education and related services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
2020-03-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 H.J. 480
2020-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 421
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 458
2020-03-02SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 388
2020-02-27SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
2020-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 338
2020-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 362
2020-02-21HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1.
2020-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-04HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 117
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 98

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback