SD HB1174 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 24. S.J. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 24. S.J. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the date of kindergarten enrollment eligibility.
Title
Establish the date of kindergarten enrollment eligibility.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Sen. David Johnson [R] |
Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Education Deferred to another day (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Education Deferred to another day (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 24. S.J. 387 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Education Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 256 |
2020-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 7. H.J. 303 |
2020-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 302 Amendment 1174B |
2020-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283 |
2020-02-12 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |