SD HB1174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning alcoholic beverage licenses issued at the county fairgrounds.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning alcoholic beverage licenses issued at the county fairgrounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Signed by Governor H.J. 732 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 638 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 593 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2011-02-25 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 533 | |
2011-02-25 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1174ta | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-07 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 335 | |
2011-02-03 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 281 | |
2011-02-02 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-02 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 259 | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 184 |