SD HB1173 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 H.J. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 H.J. 763
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the distribution of funds from the building South Dakota fund.
Title
Revise the distribution of funds from the building South Dakota fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Rep. Jason Kettwig [R] |
Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 H.J. 763 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 686 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 648 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 616 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 556 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 8. H.J. 513 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 425 |
2017-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 252 |