SD HB1169 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-10)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit the use of certain electronic devices while driving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit the use of certain electronic devices while driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
2020-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 H.J. 538
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 470
2020-03-05SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 498
2020-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 419
2020-03-03SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
2020-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 293
2020-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 26. H.J. 316
2020-02-13HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
2020-02-13HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1169B
2020-02-13HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1169A
2020-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-04HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 117
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 98

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback