SD HB1166 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the telecommunications services program to include current and developing technology.
Title
Revise the telecommunications services program to include current and developing technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 648 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 732 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 599 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 574 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 453 |
2014-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 511 |
2014-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493 |
2014-02-19 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 444 |
2014-02-19 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1166oa |
2014-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 155 |