SD HB1166 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the locations where the local boards of equalization may meet.
Title
Clarify the locations where the local boards of equalization may meet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Signed by Governor H.J. 612 | |
2010-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 424 | |
2010-02-19 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 498 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 378 | |
2010-02-17 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 344 | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 279 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 328 | |
2010-02-04 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 310 | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 219 |