SD HB1165 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain provisions providing for a pilot charter school for Native American students if the state had received a federal grant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain provisions providing for a pilot charter school for Native American students if the state had received a federal grant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
2018-03-08SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747
2018-03-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 749
2018-03-05SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 689
2018-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 639
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-27SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 609
2018-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-02-07SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 399
2018-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 360
2018-02-02HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-02HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 309
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 176

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback