SD HB1165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for annually updated financial interest statements for any person elected to statewide or local office.
Title
Provide for annually updated financial interest statements for any person elected to statewide or local office.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Jamison [R] | Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] |
Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] |
Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 686 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 651 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 606 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 587 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 568 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 500 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 430 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 401 |
2017-02-15 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1165fb |
2017-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 250 |