SD HB1163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize farm mutual insurers to invest funds in certain stocks and market funds.
Title
Authorize farm mutual insurers to invest funds in certain stocks and market funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 742 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 671 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 563 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 638 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 516 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 496 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 330 |
2014-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 401 |
2014-02-10 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 347 |
2014-02-10 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1163sb |
2014-02-10 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1163sa |
2014-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 154 |