SD HB1162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions pertaining to time of school district elections.
Title
Revise certain provisions pertaining to time of school district elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 344 |
2024-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 29. H.J. 337 |
2024-02-13 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. |
2024-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-06 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 6. |
2024-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 176 |