SD HB1162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the placement of a proposed constitutional amendment on the ballot at a special election held at the same time as the next primary election, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Provide for the placement of a proposed constitutional amendment on the ballot at a special election held at the same time as the next primary election, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 778 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 9. H.J. 723 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 722 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed S.J. 656 Amendment 1162otb |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1162od |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 556 |
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 534 |
2018-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 492 |
2018-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 480 |
2018-02-14 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 449 |
2018-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 176 |