SD HB1162 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the platting and annexation of subdivisions.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the platting and annexation of subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor H.J. 708 | |
2012-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 587 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 511 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 538 | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 468 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-15 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 433 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 299 | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 324 | |
2012-02-02 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 294 | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 152 |