SD HB1158 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide medical care for certain unborn children.
Title
Provide medical care for certain unborn children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 545 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 478 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 292 |
2014-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 22. H.J. 364 |
2014-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 364 Amendment 1158ja |
2014-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 341 |
2014-02-06 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 306 |
2014-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 153 |