SD HB1157 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the Governor's authority to enter the Midwestern Regional Higher Education Compact on behalf of the state, to repeal the Midwestern Regional Higher Education Compact, to provide for withdrawal of South Dakota from the compact.
Title
Repeal the Governor's authority to enter the Midwestern Regional Higher Education Compact on behalf of the state, to repeal the Midwestern Regional Higher Education Compact, to provide for withdrawal of South Dakota from the compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 480 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 299 | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 323 Amendment 1157xta | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 322 | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 322 Amendment 1157xa | |
2012-02-06 | Immediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) H.J. 322 | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 37, NAYS 32. H.J. 321 | |
2012-02-02 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. H.J. 293 | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 151 |