SD HB1156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow a concealed pistol in the capitol with an enhanced concealed pistol permit.
Title
Allow a concealed pistol in the capitol with an enhanced concealed pistol permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Veto override (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 771 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 42, NAYS 27. H.J. 766 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor on March 17, 2017 H.J. 763 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 686 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 646 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 614 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 356 |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 20. H.J. 351 |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 351 Amendment 1156cb |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 350 Amendment 1156ca |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337 |
2017-02-06 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 302 |
2017-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 249 |