SD HB1155 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise various trust provisions.
Title
Revise various trust provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanford Adelstein [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Marc Feinstein [D] |
Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Signed by Governor H.J. 732 | |
2011-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Signed by President S.J. 640 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 591 | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 566 | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 500 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 465 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 | |
2011-02-14 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 368 | |
2011-02-14 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1155ja | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 168 |