SD HB1154 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding motor vehicle license plates.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding motor vehicle license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 437 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 386 |
2020-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 421 |
2020-02-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-25 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-25 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1154A |
2020-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to House Transportation H.J. 214 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |