SD HB1154 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require persons convicted of crimes involving domestic violence to support domestic violence programs.
Title
Require persons convicted of crimes involving domestic violence to support domestic violence programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 633 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 566 | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 375 | |
2011-02-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 29. H.J. 323 | |
2011-02-08 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 323 Amendment 1154jc | |
2011-02-07 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304 | |
2011-02-02 | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1154jta | |
2011-02-02 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 261 | |
2011-02-02 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1154ja | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 168 |