SD HB1153 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the limited possession of a knife in the state capitol.
Title
Authorize the limited possession of a knife in the state capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 299 |
2020-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 273 |
2020-02-11 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 257 |
2020-02-10 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-10 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |