SD HB1153 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the Board of Education from adopting certain standards for the subject of history.
Title
Prohibit the Board of Education from adopting certain standards for the subject of history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 520 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 401 | |
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 26. H.J. 340 | |
2011-02-07 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 1153cta | |
2011-02-07 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 286 | |
2011-02-07 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1153cb | |
2011-02-07 | Education Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. | |
2011-02-07 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1153ca | |
2011-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-02 | Education Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 168 |