SD HB1152 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide financial assistance for school sentinel training.
Title
Provide financial assistance for school sentinel training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 255 |
2020-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 25. H.J. 300 |
2020-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 273 |
2020-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 258 |
2020-02-10 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 5. |
2020-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |