SD HB1150 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the issuance of certain hunting licenses to nonresident military veterans at the resident rate.
Title
Provide for the issuance of certain hunting licenses to nonresident military veterans at the resident rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 616 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 403 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 30. H.J. 391 |
2017-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378 |
2017-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363 |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 352 |
2017-02-07 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 319 |
2017-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 247 |