SD HB1149 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide an appropriation for the Native American achievement schools grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide an appropriation for the Native American achievement schools grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseEducation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 459
2019-02-20HouseEducation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 9.
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 219
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 202

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback