SD HB1149 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the setting of the salary of legislators.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the setting of the salary of legislators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate State Affairs Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 504 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 339 |
2015-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 10. H.J. 332 |
2015-02-04 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 280 |
2015-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 202 |