SD HB1145 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the payment of salary and compensation to legislators.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the payment of salary and compensation to legislators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 768 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 729 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 658 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 670 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 0. H.J. 640 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 10. S.J. 588 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 588 Amendment 1145oa |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 552 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 542 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 504 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 339 |
2015-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 1. H.J. 331 |
2015-02-04 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 280 |
2015-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 201 |