SD HB1142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enhance the support for public postsecondary technical institutes, to transfer certain funds, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Enhance the support for public postsecondary technical institutes, to transfer certain funds, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 787 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 684 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 781 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 767 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 762 Amendment Cc1142 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 667 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 660 Amendment Cc1142 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 746 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 647 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 623 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 622 Amendment 1142ma |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 602 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1142ytc |
2014-03-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 547 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1142yb |
2014-03-05 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1142oa |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 453 |
2014-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 510 |
2014-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493 |
2014-02-19 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 444 |
2014-02-19 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1142sb |
2014-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 149 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Counties
Municipal Government
Postsecondary Education
School Districts
State Aid to Education
Taxes
Counties
Municipal Government
Postsecondary Education
School Districts
State Aid to Education
Taxes