SD HB1142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 23. S.J. 669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 23. S.J. 669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promote patient choice in selecting health care providers.
Title
Promote patient choice in selecting health care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 23. S.J. 669 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 635 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 1142jb |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 522 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 30. H.J. 455 |
2013-02-13 | House | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 375 |
2013-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 375 Amendment 1142ja |
2013-02-12 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 351 |
2013-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 134 |