SD HB1141 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create the medical reinsurance program and to make an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the medical reinsurance program and to make an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Deferred to another day (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseCommerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
2021-02-22HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. Amendment 1141A
2021-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-17HouseCommerce and Energy Deferred to another day, Passed
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseReferred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 178
2021-01-28HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 148

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback