SD HB1139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-02 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-02 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the malt beverage license to also allow the sale of spirits produced by an artisan distiller.
Title
Revise the malt beverage license to also allow the sale of spirits produced by an artisan distiller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-01-31 - House - Reconsidered (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-01-31 - House - Reconsidered (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 4 |
2024-02-02 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 9. H.J. 4 |
2024-02-02 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 3 Amendment 1139A |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | House | Commerce and Energy Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2024-01-29 | House | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2024-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 164 |