SD HB1139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Remove the prohibition against certain appointive officers lobbying after completing their service in state government.
Title
Remove the prohibition against certain appointive officers lobbying after completing their service in state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Signed by Governor H.J. 694 | |
2011-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 585 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 552 | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-25 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 533 | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 357 | |
2011-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 20. H.J. 303 | |
2011-02-02 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 259 | |
2011-02-02 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1139ja | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 165 |