SD HB1137 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2018 H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the registration of lobbyists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the registration of lobbyists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2018 H.J. 740
2018-03-06SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 H.J. 701
2018-03-05SenateSigned by the President S.J. 704
2018-02-28SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 653
2018-02-27SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 621
2018-02-23SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-23SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 576
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-02-02SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 351
2018-02-01HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 291
2018-01-31HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-01-31HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 240
2018-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 149

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1137&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1137P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1137ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25038&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25187&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25038&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25187&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26265&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26486&Session=2018

Bill Comments 750

feedback