SD HB1137 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the distribution of registration fees from noncommercial gross weight vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the distribution of registration fees from noncommercial gross weight vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
2016-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860
2016-03-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 591
2016-03-09SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 845
2016-03-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 569
2016-03-07SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 539
2016-03-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-03-02SenateTaxation Deferred to another day, Passed
2016-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 428
2016-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 646
2016-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622
2016-02-18HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 442
2016-02-18HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1137oa
2016-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 211

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback