SD HB1137 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Impact education in South Dakota, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impact education in South Dakota, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 1 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Amend the amendment (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26SenateSigned by Governor
2013-03-25SenateDeliver line item veto to the Governor H.J. 848
2013-03-25SenateHouse of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration, Failed, YEAS 1, NAYS 65. H.J. 845
2013-03-25SenateLine Item Veto H.J. 843
2013-03-08SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 837
2013-03-08SenateSigned by President S.J. 745
2013-03-07SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 815
2013-03-06SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 765
2013-03-05SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 680 Amendment 1137mta
2013-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 679
2013-03-05SenateAmend the amendment, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 678 Amendment 1137ta
2013-03-05SenateSenate Hoghoused, Passed S.J. 678 Amendment 1137mb
2013-03-04SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 636
2013-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-02-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 522
2013-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 468
2013-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2013-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 425
2013-02-13HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 378
2013-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 133

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback