SD HB1137 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2012 and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2012 and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by Governor H.J. 734
2012-03-02 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 730
2012-03-01 Signed by Speaker H.J. 718
2012-03-01 Signed by President S.J. 647
2012-03-01 House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 714
2012-02-29 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 686
2012-02-28 Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 615 Amendment 1137utb
2012-02-28 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 615
2012-02-28 Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 611 Amendment 1137ud
2012-02-27 Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1137mta
2012-02-27 Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 570
2012-02-27 Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1137ma
2012-02-27 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-23 Deferred by Chair
2012-02-23 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-22 Deferred by Chair
2012-02-22 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-15 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 438
2012-02-14 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 7. H.J. 469
2012-02-13 Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 426
2012-02-13 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-23 First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 147

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback