SD HB1136 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain election recount provisions.
Title
Revise certain election recount provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 24, 2017 H.J. 540 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 511 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 439 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 416 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 391 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 343 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 335 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 334 Amendment 1136ja |
2017-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 314 |
2017-02-03 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 288 |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 228 |