SD HB1134 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for access to certain property for the purpose of making surveys.
Title
Provide for access to certain property for the purpose of making surveys.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Sen. Jim Peterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 871 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 607 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 854 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 571 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 521 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. Amendment 1134fc |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 453 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 674 |
2016-02-22 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 618 |
2016-02-22 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. Amendment 1134rb |
2016-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 200 |