SD HB1133 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 40. H.J. 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding operating a vehicle after consumption of a controlled drug or substance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding operating a vehicle after consumption of a controlled drug or substance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Removed from table (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 40. H.J. 564
2018-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 563 Amendment 1133kb
2018-02-21HouseState Affairs Title amended, Passed H.J. 539 Amendment 1133kta
2018-02-21HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
2018-02-21HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1133ka
2018-02-21HouseState Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2018-01-31HouseState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 241
2018-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 149

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1133&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1133P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1133HST.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25037&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25037&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26070&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26098&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26141&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26252&Session=2018

Bill Comments 750

feedback